Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Brassert

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

Titular Bishop of Daulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625²BornKöln
165530.0Ordained PriestPriest of Speyer, Germany
25 Sep 167348.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany
25 Sep 167348.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Daulia
28 Jan 167449.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daulia
10 Mar 167449.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
1676²51.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
Mar 1684³59.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Speyer, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Brassert:
Bishop Johann Brassert (born 1625, died Mar 1684) Auxiliary Bishop of Speyer

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,954
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 182
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1674, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015