Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Daniel von Gudenus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1624Born
15 Jun 164723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
29 Apr 168055.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
29 Apr 168055.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
7 Jul 168056.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica
11 Feb 169469.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Daniel von Gudenus
Bishop Johann Daniel von Gudenus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarburg

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 400
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast