Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Manuel Gregorio Indaburu (Yndaburu)

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1787Born
13 Mar 181325.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Mar 181325.2Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 184355.4AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
2 Nov 184456.8Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
16 Dec 184456.9DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Gregorio Indaburu (Yndaburu)
Bishop José Manuel Gregorio Indaburu (Yndaburu) (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Paz

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for .1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 295
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast