Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Ibáñez, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Amoy, China

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1848Born
11 Sep 186618.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Apr 187223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 May 189344.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China
4 May 189344.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
8 Oct 189345.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
14 Oct 189345.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Amoy, China

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Ibáñez
Bishop Ignacio Ibáñez O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Amoy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToro, Diocese of Zamora, Spain

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 May 2017