Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Hughes, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gibraltar

Titular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1788BornWexford, Ireland
15 Mar 183950.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar
15 Mar 183950.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
21 Apr 183950.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
Nov 1856³68.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Gibraltar
12 Oct 186072.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gibraltar

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry Hughes
Bishop Henry Hughes O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gibraltar

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 212
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1839, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Oct 2016