Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fidèle Sutter, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tunis

Titular Archbishop of Ancyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1796BornFerrara, Italy
5 Jul 184448.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tunis, Tunisia
5 Jul 184448.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosalia
29 Sep 184448.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosalia
28 Jun 188185.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tunis, Tunisia
2 Aug 188185.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ancyra
30 Aug 188387.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tunis, Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Fidèle Sutter:
Archbishop Fidèle Sutter O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tunis

  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 100
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013