Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josyf Holovach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian)

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1924BornImstechevo
14 Sep 194723.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 198358.6Ordained BishopBishop
16 Jan 199166.4ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199166.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
18 Jun 200075.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Josyf Holovach:
Bishop Josyf Holovach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mukachevo (Munkács)

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/op/c12: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,952
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,264
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013