Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentin Herrgott, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

Titular Bishop of Samosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1864Born
21 Sep 188924.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
18 Feb 192863.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cambogia, Cambodia
18 Feb 192863.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Samosata
1 May 192863.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samosata
17 Dec 192864.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
23 Mar 193671.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Valentin Herrgott (VIAF: 102391359)
Bishop Valentin Herrgott M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Phnom-Penh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMitzach, France
Ordained BishopChapel, Seminary, Culaogien

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 29
  • loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast