Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Guo Wenzhi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1918Born
Dec 1948³30.8Ordained PriestPriest
1989²70.9SelectedBishop of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China
17 May 198971.3Ordained BishopBishop of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China
1 Aug 200082.5ResignedBishop of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China
29 Jun 200688.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Guo Wenzhi
Bishop Paul Guo Wenzhi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQiqihar
Death PlaceHali

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast