Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christoph Ignaz von Gudenus

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Anemurium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1674³BornErfurt
25 Jul 170025.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
1 Aug 170025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
20 Mar 172651.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
20 Mar 172651.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
9 Jun 172651.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
11 Dec 174773.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Christoph Ignaz von Gudenus:
Bishop Christoph Ignaz von Gudenus (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 83
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 20
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 85

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015