Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Leonard Pfaff

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1775BornHünfeld
23 Sep 179722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Fulda, Germany
22 Sep 179823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
15 Nov 183156.2SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
24 Feb 183256.5ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
2 Sep 183257.0Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
3 Jan 184872.4DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Leonard Pfaff:
Bishop Johann Leonard Pfaff (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013