Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mijo Gorski

Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Epidaurum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1952 Born
26 Jun 197724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
3 May 201057.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
3 May 201057.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Epidaurum
3 Jul 201057.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epidaurum

MicroData Summary for Mijo Gorski
Bishop Mijo Gorski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMihovljan

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Zagreb.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,752

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast