Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Antonio Cardinal Fernández de Córdoba Portocarrero Guzmán y Aguilar

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1696Born
18 Dec 175458.9Elevated to Cardinal
4 Aug 175559.5AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
28 Sep 175559.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
26 Mar 177175.1DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio Fernández de Córdoba Portocarrero Guzmán y Aguilar
Luis Antonio Cardinal Fernández de Córdoba Portocarrero Guzmán y Aguilar (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontilla

  • a bishop for 15.4 years
  • a cardinal for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1754
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 73, Number 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018