Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan Rodríguez Reymúndez

Deceased

Priest of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1770Born
17 Nov 179121.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lima, Peru
19 Nov 179525.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lima, Peru
9 Jun 183665.9SelectedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
25 May 183867.8DiedPriest of Lima, Peru
17 Sep 183868.1ConfirmedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Juan Rodríguez Reymúndez
Father Juan Rodríguez Reymúndez (born , died ) Priest of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLima

  • a priest for 42.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 208
  • c01: LB, 26 Jan 2013
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast