Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthieu Giannicio (Joanitius)

Deceased

Bishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1662³Born
22 Sep 168523.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Mar 168724.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 171755.0AppointedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
7 Sep 171755.3Ordained BishopBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
1720¹57.6DiedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthieu Giannicio (Joanitius)
Bishop Matthieu Giannicio (Joanitius) (born , died 1720) Bishop of Scardona (Skradin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSplit

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast