Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Vidovich

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652¹BornSibenic
8 Sep 167422.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 171664.2AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
19 Apr 171664.2Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
22 Mar 172169.2DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Vidovich:
Bishop Jean Vidovich (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

  • a priest for 46.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1716, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015