Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Cupilli, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1659Born
12 Jun 168323.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Clerks Regular of Somasca
11 Jul 168323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
1 Jun 169939.5AppointedBishop of Trogir (Traù), Croatia
8 Jun 169939.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trogir (Traù), Croatia
12 Mar 170848.3AppointedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia
11 Dec 171960.0DiedArchbishop of Split (Spalato), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Stefano Cupilli
Archbishop Stefano Cupilli C.R.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Split (Spalato)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a priest for 36.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361, and Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast