Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Federico Maria Giovanelli

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1726BornVenezia
21 Apr 175427.3Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
22 Apr 177346.3SelectedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
12 Jul 177346.5ConfirmedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
18 Jul 177346.5Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
20 May 177649.4AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
10 Jan 180073.0DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Federico Maria Giovanelli:
Patriarch Federico Maria Giovanelli (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170, and Page 436
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1773, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015