Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antun Belglava

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1730Born
7 Apr 175322.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 178151.4AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
30 Sep 178151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
28 Sep 178757.4AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
25 Feb 178958.8DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antun Belglava
Bishop Antun Belglava (born , died ) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZadar

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 190, and Page 411
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1781, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast