Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Cosserich Teodosio

Deceased

Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1722Born
23 Dec 174725.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 178764.9AppointedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
Oct 1787³64.9Ordained BishopBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia
Feb 1802³79.2DiedBishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Cosserich Teodosio
Bishop Joseph Cosserich Teodosio (born , died Feb 1802) Bishop of Korčula (Curzola, Cursola)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSibenik

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 190
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1787, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast