Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Maria Ambiveri

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bergamo

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1727BornBergamo
27 Mar 175123.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bergamo, Italy
3 Apr 177547.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
3 Apr 177547.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
28 May 177547.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
1782¹54.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Maria Ambiveri:
Bishop Antonio Maria Ambiveri (born , died 1782) Auxiliary Bishop of Bergamo

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 108
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Dec 2015