Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Louis Giasson, P.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yoro, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1939Born
13 May 196525.4Solemn VowsMember of Société des Missions-Étrangères
18 Dec 196526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Société des Missions-Étrangères
19 Sep 200565.7AppointedBishop of Yoro, Honduras
12 Dec 200566.0Ordained BishopBishop of Yoro, Honduras
21 Jan 201474.1ResignedBishop of Yoro, Honduras
12 Feb 201474.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Yoro, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Giasson
Bishop Jean-Louis Giasson P.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIslet-sur-Mer, Canada

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2005
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,018
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2014
  • d: CB, 13 Feb 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast