Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Cavalli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Dec 1668AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
23 Dec 1668Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
10 Jun 1689DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Cavalli
Bishop Bonaventura Cavalli O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmantea

  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1668, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast