Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Gardini

Deceased

Bishop of Bertinoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1879BornLe Budrie di Persiceto
29 Mar 190222.5Ordained PriestPriest
9 May 193151.6AppointedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
28 Jun 193151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
8 Sep 193151.9InstalledBishop of Bertinoro, Italy
31 Jan 195070.3DiedBishop of Bertinoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gardini:
Bishop Francesco Gardini (born , died ) Bishop of Bertinoro

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015