Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Eugênio Galrão Leite de Almeida

Auxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

Titular Bishop of Albulae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1959 BornAracaju
10 Dec 198930.9Ordained PriestPriest of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
30 Apr 200344.3AppointedBishop of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil
16 Jul 200344.5Ordained BishopBishop of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil
22 Aug 200344.6InstalledBishop of Estância, Sergipe, Brazil
25 Sep 201354.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
25 Sep 201354.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Albulae

MicroData Summary for Marco Eugênio Galrão Leite de Almeida:
Bishop Marco Eugênio Galrão Leite de Almeida (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,425
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 25 Sep 2013