Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Galbusera Fumagalli, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pucallpa, Peru

Titular Bishop of Mascula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1940 Born
16 Aug 196322.9ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
22 Dec 196727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
18 Jul 200766.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru
18 Jul 200766.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mascula
26 Aug 200766.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mascula
8 Sep 200868.0SucceededVicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru
31 Jul 201978.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Pucallpa, Peru

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Galbusera Fumagalli
Bishop Gaetano Galbusera Fumagalli S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pucallpa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarasso-Missaglia, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chimbote, Diocese of Chimbote

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Pucallpa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,493
  • s: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2008
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast