Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Avis Fulcher

Deceased

Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1922Born
28 Feb 194826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Columbus, Ohio, USA
24 May 197654.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Columbus, Ohio, USA
24 May 197654.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Morosbisdus
18 Jul 197654.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Morosbisdus
8 Feb 198361.0AppointedBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
14 Apr 198361.2InstalledBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
25 Jan 198461.9DiedBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for George Avis Fulcher
Bishop George Avis Fulcher (born , died ) Bishop of Lafayette in Indiana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceColumbus

  • a priest for 35.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast