Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Carabelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1886BornCarnago
17 Jul 191023.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 192134.6AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
22 May 192134.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
16 Jul 193245.9DiedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Carabelli:
Archbishop Giacomo Carabelli (born , died ) Archbishop of Siracusa

  • a priest for 21.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015