Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Desclaux

Deceased

Bishop of Acqs (Dax)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1593¹BornMugron
11 Apr 163946.2AppointedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
2 Jun 163946.4Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
4 Apr 165865.2DiedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Desclaux:
Bishop Jacques Desclaux (died ) Bishop of Acqs (Dax)

  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015