Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benito Forcelledo Tuero

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1802BornLibardón
1826¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 185250.2AppointedBishop of Astorga, Spain
13 Jun 185250.4Ordained BishopBishop of Astorga, Spain
23 Jun 1858³56.4DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benito Forcelledo Tuero:
Bishop Benito Forcelledo Tuero (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 160, Number 877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013