Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolás Luis Lezo y Garro

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria

Titular See: (Abbot/San Ildefonso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1788Born
3 Oct 185062.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
17 Nov 185062.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
5 Oct 185466.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Luis Lezo y Garro
Archbishop Nicolás Luis Lezo y Garro (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopS. Isidore, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,420
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 511
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,700, Page 160, Number 874
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,850, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast