Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerónimo Fernández y Andrés

Deceased

Bishop of Palencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1799BornSaelices de Mayorga
1824¹24.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 185354.1SelectedBishop of Palencia, Spain
22 Dec 185354.4ConfirmedBishop of Palencia, Spain
30 Apr 185454.8Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
23 Mar 186565.7DiedBishop of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerónimo Fernández y Andrés:
Bishop Jerónimo Fernández y Andrés (born , died ) Bishop of Palencia

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 435
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 163, Number 894

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013