Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Bernardo Morete Bodelón

Deceased

Bishop of Astorga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1776BornMagaz de Arriba
24 Jun 182447.8SelectedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
27 Sep 182448.1ConfirmedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
21 Nov 182448.3Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
8 Jan 182548.4SelectedBishop of Astorga, Spain
21 Mar 182548.6ConfirmedBishop of Astorga, Spain
2 Jan 182851.4DiedBishop of Astorga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Bernardo Morete Bodelón:
Bishop Manuel Bernardo Morete Bodelón (born , died ) Bishop of Astorga

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 93, and Page 130
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 141, Number 764

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 27 Oct 2013