Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costanzo-Michele Fea

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1787BornVoghera
16 Sep 181023.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Sep 181023.1Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 183548.1SelectedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
1 Feb 183648.5ConfirmedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
10 Apr 183648.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
2 Nov 185366.2DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Costanzo-Michele Fea (VIAF: 88988423)
Bishop Costanzo-Michele Fea (born , died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1836, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016