Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Accusani

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1765BornAcqui
16 Feb 178822.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 183064.8SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
5 Jul 183065.1ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
19 Jul 184378.1DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Accusani:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Accusani (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a priest for 55.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013