Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Andrea Cardinal Della Valle

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1463BornRome
2 Dec 149633.0AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
23 Feb 150844.2AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
1 Jul 151753.6Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151753.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
2 Dec 151754.0AppointedAdministrator of Caiazzo, Italy
18 Feb 151854.2AppointedAdministrator of Gallipoli, Italy
5 May 151854.4AppointedAdministrator of Nicastro, Italy
17 May 151854.5ResignedAdministrator of Nicastro, Italy
10 Dec 151855.0ResignedAdministrator of Caiazzo, Italy
26 Oct 151955.9AppointedAdministrator of Valva, Italy
26 Oct 151955.9AppointedAdministrator of Sulmona, Italy
152056.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
20 Mar 152157.3AppointedAdministrator of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
18 Jun 152157.6ResignedAdministrator of Valva, Italy
18 Jun 152157.6ResignedAdministrator of Sulmona, Italy
4 Sep 152258.8AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
10 Sep 152258.8ResignedAdministrator of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
26 Nov 152360.0ResignedBishop of Mileto, Italy
17 Oct 152460.9ResignedAdministrator of Gallipoli, Italy
14 Nov 152461.0ResignedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
27 Mar 152561.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
21 Apr 153369.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
12 Dec 153370.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
3 Aug 153470.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Andrea Della Valle:
Cardinal Andrea Della Valle (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 17.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 180, and Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013