Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspard-Joseph Labis

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1792BornWarcoing
18 Feb 181522.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
23 Sep 181523.3Ordained PriestPriest of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
6 Apr 183542.8AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
10 May 183542.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
16 Nov 187280.5DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Gaspard-Joseph Labis:
Bishop Gaspard-Joseph Labis (born , died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 373
  • ob/c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014