Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hendrik-Frans (Henri-François) Bracq

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1804BornGand
2 Aug 182723.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
27 Mar 186561.1AppointedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
1 May 186561.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
17 Jun 188884.3DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Hendrik-Frans (Henri-François) Bracq:
Bishop Hendrik-Frans (Henri-François) Bracq (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 282
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014