Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Auguste Van Heule, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India

Titular Archbishop of Amida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1821Born
28 Sep 183917.8ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
12 Sep 185129.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Sep 186442.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India
9 Sep 186442.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
28 Oct 186442.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amida
4 Jun 186543.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India

MicroData Summary for Auguste Van Heule
Archbishop Auguste Van Heule S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Bengal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYpres, Belgium
Ordained BishopInst. St. Ignace, Anvers

  • a priest for 13.7 years
  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95
  • ob/c2+: Google Books
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast