Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Leonardo de Battice

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

Titular Bishop of Pella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1839BornGand
19 Apr 186222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Dec 187738.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
28 Dec 187738.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
20 Jan 187838.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
23 Nov 188546.5ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
13 Aug 188950.2DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Leonardo de Battice:
Bishop Gustavo Leonardo de Battice (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 282, and Page 445
  • c1+: Google Books

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014