Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephen Nweke Ezeanya

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Onitsha, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1921Born
20 Dec 195332.7Ordained PriestPriest of Onitsha, Nigeria
9 Mar 198563.9AppointedArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
11 May 198564.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
25 Feb 199573.9RetiredArchbishop of Onitsha, Nigeria
12 Nov 199675.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Onitsha, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Stephen Nweke Ezeanya
Archbishop Stephen Nweke Ezeanya (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Onitsha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNnokwa

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast