Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélemi d’Elbène

Deceased

Bishop of Agen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹Born
1 Mar 163631.1SelectedBishop of Agen, France
9 Jun 163631.4ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
2 Nov 163631.8Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
4 Mar 166358.1DiedBishop of Agen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Barthélemi d’Elbène:
Bishop Barthélemi d’Elbène (born 1605, died ) Bishop of Agen

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 72
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 1 Jul 2015