Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Elias Tawil

Deceased

Eparch Emeritus of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1913BornDamasco, Syria
20 Jul 193622.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Aug 195945.7SelectedPatriarchal Vicar
23 Oct 195945.8ConfirmedPatriarchal Vicar
23 Oct 195945.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
1 Jan 196046.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myra dei Greco-Melkiti
31 Oct 196955.8AppointedPatriarchal Exarch of United States of America (Melkite Greek)
28 Jun 197662.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
14 Feb 197763.1InstalledEparch of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
2 Dec 198975.9RetiredEparch of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA
17 Feb 199985.1DiedEparch Emeritus of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston) (Melkite Greek), USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Elias Tawil:
Archbishop Joseph Elias Tawil (born , died ) Eparch Emeritus of Newton (Our Lady of the Annunciation in Boston)

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 1
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013