Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michel Hakim, B.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1921BornMaghdouché
10 Nov 194726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Arrouhbaniat Albassiliat Almoukhalissiat (Melkite Greek)
25 Aug 197756.3AppointedBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
10 Sep 197756.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saïda (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
13 Oct 198059.4AppointedApostolic Exarch of Canada (Melkite Greek)
13 Oct 198059.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia dei Greco-Melkiti
1 Sep 198463.3AppointedArchbishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada
30 Jun 199877.1RetiredArchbishop of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada
22 Nov 200685.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal (Melkite Greek), Canada

MicroData Summary for Michel Hakim:
Archbishop Michel Hakim B.S. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint-Sauveur de Montréal

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015