Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Arnoldi

Deceased

Bishop of Trier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1798BornBaden
17 Mar 182123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
21 Jun 184244.5SelectedBishop of Trier, Germany
22 Jul 184244.5ConfirmedBishop of Trier, Germany
18 Sep 184244.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trier, Germany
7 Jan 186466.0DiedBishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Arnoldi:
Bishop Wilhelm Arnoldi (born , died ) Bishop of Trier

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013