Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toussaint Duvernin

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

Titular Bishop of Arad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1713Born
23 May 175743.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
23 May 175743.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
31 Jul 175743.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
8 Aug 178571.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Toussaint Duvernin
Bishop Toussaint Duvernin (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVic-le-Comte

  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 94, and Page 452
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast