Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Anton Durcovici

Deceased

Bishop of Iaşi, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1888Born
24 Sep 191022.3Ordained PriestPriest of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
30 Oct 194759.4AppointedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
5 Apr 194859.8Ordained BishopBishop of Iaşi, Romania
20 Dec 195163.5DiedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
17 May 2014Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Anton Durcovici
Bishop Bl. Anton Durcovici (born , died ) Bishop of Iaşi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBad Deutsch-Altenburg

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast