Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Dupont de Poursat

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1761BornChabanais
1785¹23.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 May 180745.9SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
3 Aug 180746.2ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
6 Jan 180846.6Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
17 Sep 183574.3DiedBishop of Coutances, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Dupont de Poursat:
Bishop Pierre Dupont de Poursat (born , died ) Bishop of Coutances

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 161

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013