Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William J. Quarter

Deceased

Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1806Born
19 Sep 182923.6Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
28 Nov 184337.8AppointedBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Mar 184438.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Apr 184842.2DiedBishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for William J. Quarter (VIAF: 315945371)
Bishop William J. Quarter (born , died ) Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillurine, Diocese of Killaloe, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Diocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast