Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro da Silva, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cochin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1647¹BornSão Pantaleão
7 Sep 168538.6SelectedBishop of Cochin, India
8 Jan 168942.0ConfirmedBishop of Cochin, India
20 Mar 168942.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
15 Mar 169144.2DiedBishop of Cochin, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro da Silva:
Bishop Pedro da Silva O.S.A. (born 1647, died ) Bishop of Cochin

  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 163
  • bp/ob/c2: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015